Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gicka, Ronald, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Timothy M Ingram, Esq, against Nowak, Richard Edward, represented by Douglas C Saltarelli, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Circuit Court in and for Pinellas County, Florida. The plaintiff, Ronald Gicka, is suing the defendant, Richard Edward Nowak, for damages exceeding $30,000. The alleged cause of action is a motor vehicl...
COMPLAINT Doc # 2
Date: January 15, 2021SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 3 Party: NOWAK, RICHARD EDWARD
Date: January 15, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 5
Date: January 15, 2021DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 4
Date: January 15, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 6
Date: January 15, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 18
Date: July 14, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 19
Date: July 14, 2021NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 20 09022021
Date: September 02, 2021SUMMONS RETURNED - NO SERVICE ATTACHED Doc # 22 Party: NOWAK, RICHARD EDWARD
Date: February 08, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 17
Date: July 02, 2021ALIAS SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 23 Party: NOWAK, RICHARD EDWARD
Date: February 08, 2022MANDATORY CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Doc # 14
Date: May 28, 2021ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Doc # 8 Party: NOWAK, RICHARD EDWARD
Date: March 09, 2021REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 21
Date: September 16, 2021ALIAS SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 25 040522 12:35 Party: NOWAK, RICHARD EDWARD
Date: April 12, 2022ALIAS SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 24 Party: NOWAK, RICHARD EDWARD
Date: April 12, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 16 ANSWERS TO AUTOMOBILE NEGLIGENCE INTERROGATORIES
Date: July 02, 2021REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Doc # 13
Date: May 18, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 10
Date: March 09, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 11
Date: March 09, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 1
Date: January 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
ALIAS SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 25 040522 12:35 Party: NOWAK, RICHARD EDWARD
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
April 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
ALIAS SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 24 Party: NOWAK, RICHARD EDWARD
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED - NO SERVICE ATTACHED Doc # 22 Party: NOWAK, RICHARD EDWARD
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
ALIAS SUMMONS - ISSUED Doc # 23 Party: NOWAK, RICHARD EDWARD
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 21
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 20 09022021
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 18
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 19
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 17
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 16 ANSWERS TO AUTOMOBILE NEGLIGENCE INTERROGATORIES
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.