Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Jorge L Palma, Esq, against Mooney, Melissa L, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KELLY, LORRAINE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Bank of America, N.A. against Melissa L Mooney. The complaint states that Bank of America is a national banking association and that Melissa L Mooney applied for and received a credit account owned and administered by Bank ...
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 5
Date: December 31, 2019RESPONSE Doc # 8 TO ORDER FOR SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE
Date: December 15, 2020NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE Doc # 6
Date: December 31, 2019EXHIBIT Doc # 4 ACCOUNT SUMMARY
Date: December 31, 2019SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 2 ISSUED Party: MOONEY, MELISSA L
Date: December 31, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 3
Date: December 31, 2019COMPLAINT Doc # 1
Date: December 31, 2019SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Doc # 10 Party: MOONEY, MELISSA L
Date: January 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 11
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer KELLY, LORRAINE) CURRENT ACTIVITY
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Doc # 10 Party: MOONEY, MELISSA L
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE Doc # 9 HAS BEEN SHOWN- MATTER SHALL REMAIN OPEN
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE Doc # 8 TO ORDER FOR SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 7
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 5
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE Doc # 6
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT Doc # 4 ACCOUNT SUMMARY
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 2 ISSUED Party: MOONEY, MELISSA L
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.