Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Jorge L Palma, Esq, against Parker, Judith, represented by Sarah E Flores, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Bank of America, N.A. against Judith Parker in the County Court of Pinellas County, Florida. The complaint alleges that Judith Parker applied for and received a credit account owned by Bank of America, N.A. However, she fai...
COMPLAINT Doc # 1 FOR DAMAGES
Date: December 31, 2019SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 2 ISSUED Party: PARKER, JUDITH
Date: December 31, 2019SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 7 01/07/2020 Party: PARKER, JUDITH
Date: January 09, 2020NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE Doc # 6
Date: December 31, 2019AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 5
Date: December 31, 2019EXHIBIT Doc # 4 ACCOUNT SUMMARY
Date: December 31, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 3
Date: December 31, 2019DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS Doc # 9
Date: February 17, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 8 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES Party: PARKER, JUDITH
Date: February 17, 2020PLTF-PET'S MOTION Doc # 10 TO ADOPT SETTLEMENT STIPULATION
Date: July 15, 2020STIPULATION Doc # 11 AGREEMENT
Date: July 15, 2020FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 15
Date: January 05, 2021NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 14 W/PREJUDICE
Date: January 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 15
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 14 W/PREJUDICE
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING (R) Doc # 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL Vol./Book 21091, Page 700, 1 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED-SETTLEMENT AFTER HRG (SRS DISPO) Doc # 12
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Doc # 10 TO ADOPT SETTLEMENT STIPULATION
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION Doc # 11 AGREEMENT
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS Doc # 9
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 8 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES Party: PARKER, JUDITH
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 7 01/07/2020 Party: PARKER, JUDITH
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT Doc # 1 FOR DAMAGES
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.