Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Largo Multifamily Dst, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Charles V Barrett, Iii, against Broom, Jessica D, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 23 AS TO COUNT II W/O PREJUDICE BY Party: LARGO MULTIFAMILY DST
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 22 RETD EXECUTED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED Doc # 20
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
COPY Doc # 19 EMERGENCY MTN STAY WRIT / DENIED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING Doc # 21 DEFT EMERGENCY MTN STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED Doc # 18
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S EMERGENCY MOTION Doc # 17 STAY OF WRIT, SET ASIDE FJ AND SET HEARING
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 16 ISSUED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 15 ISSUED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Doc # 13 IN FAVOR OF PLTF Vol./Book 20851, Page 765, 1 pages
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.