Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Park Grove Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Daniel Feinman, against Dudley, Charles, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, AMY M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryBusiness Transactions |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 3 022520 9:45
Date: January 07, 2020COMPLAINT Doc # 2 WITH ATTACHMENTS
Date: December 31, 2019AMENDED COMPLAINT Doc # 5 FOR TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS W/ATTACHMENTS
Date: February 21, 2020CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 1
Date: December 31, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 7 03232020 10:00
Date: February 25, 2020ORDER DENYING Doc # 9 PROPOSED TRANSFER OF ASSIGNED PAYMENTS
Date: March 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING Doc # 9 PROPOSED TRANSFER OF ASSIGNED PAYMENTS
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BY JUDGE (SRS DISPO) Doc # 8
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 7 03232020 10:00
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Doc # 6 NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
AMENDED COMPLAINT Doc # 5 FOR TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS W/ATTACHMENTS
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 3 022520 9:45
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Doc # 4 OF APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE Doc # 4OF APPLICATION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS | |
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 3022520 9:45 | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT Doc # 2 WITH ATTACHMENTS
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.