Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ludes, Carolyn, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Tomas L Gacio, Tomas L Gacio, Esq, against Goodwin, Gregory, Goodwin, Shari, represented by Deneen Carrier, Deneen N Carrier, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, AMY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, AMY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Carolyn Ludes against Shari Goodwin, Gregory Goodwin, and Garrison Property and Casualty Insurance Company. The complaint alleges auto negligence and demands a jury trial. The damages being sought exceed $15,000.
Accordin...
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 4 ISSUED Party: GOODWIN, GREGORY
Date: December 28, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 9
Date: March 19, 2019RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 28
Date: June 28, 2019SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 3 ISSUED Party: GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: December 28, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 1
Date: December 28, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 5 ISSUED Party: GOODWIN, SHARI
Date: January 07, 2019COMPLAINT Doc # 2
Date: December 28, 2018REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 10
Date: March 19, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 8 AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF EMAIL
Date: March 19, 2019ANSWER OF Doc # 7 Party: GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: March 19, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 14 AUTOMOBILE INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 29, 2019REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 13
Date: March 29, 2019REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 20
Date: April 22, 2019REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 19
Date: April 22, 2019REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 17
Date: April 22, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 16
Date: April 22, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 23
Date: April 30, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 15
Date: April 22, 2019RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 21
Date: April 30, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 24
Date: May 15, 2019DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL Doc # 26 DISCOVERY
Date: May 31, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 22
Date: April 30, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 25
Date: May 23, 2019REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 18 W/ATTACHMENT
Date: April 22, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 30 AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: July 17, 2019NOTICE Doc # 33 OF AGREED MEDIATION 021120 1:00
Date: August 17, 2019CERTIFICATE Doc # 34 OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY
Date: August 17, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 29
Date: June 28, 2019AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO Doc # 35
Date: August 21, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 32 SHARI GOODWIN 111919 12:30
Date: August 17, 2019NOTICE Doc # 37 OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: December 18, 2019FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 41
Date: January 24, 2020NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 42 AND DIRECTING THE CLERK TO CLOSE THE COURT FILE
Date: February 21, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 38 OF MEDIATION 012220
Date: January 24, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 31 GREGORY GOODWIN 111919 9:30
Date: August 17, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 42 AND DIRECTING THE CLERK TO CLOSE THE COURT FILE
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 41
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 40 BY BY PLTF / DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE CASE / AS TO Party: GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 38 OF MEDIATION 012220
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE CLOSED (SRS) Doc # 39
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 40BY BY PLTF / DIRECTING CLERK TO CLOSE CASE / AS TOParty: GARRISON PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 38OF MEDIATION 012220 | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 41 | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED (SRS) Doc # 39 | |
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Doc # 37 OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.