Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Us Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Wendy C Manswell, against Agrippa, Monica L, Aqua Finance Inc, Florida Housing Finance Corporation, Unknown Spouse Of Monica L Agrippa, represented by Robert J Pierce, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with St. Arnold, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSt. Arnold, Jack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by U.S. Bank National Association against Monica L. Agrippa, the unknown spouse of Monica L. Agrippa, Florida Housing Finance Corporation, and Aqua Finance, Inc. The complaint alleges that Monica L. Agripp...
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED Doc # 17 011819 Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MONICA L AGRIPPA
Date: February 22, 2019FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 20
Date: March 11, 2019SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED Doc # 13 010919 Party: AQUA FINANCE INC
Date: January 14, 2019SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED Doc # 16 011819 Party: AGRIPPA, MONICA L
Date: January 24, 2019SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED Doc # 14 010919 Party: FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION
Date: January 14, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 1
Date: December 30, 2018VALUE OF REAL PROP-MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM Doc # 2
Date: December 30, 2018CERTIFICATE Doc # 4 OF POSSESSION
Date: December 30, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 7 ISSUED Party: AQUA FINANCE INC
Date: December 30, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 8 ISSUED Party: FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION
Date: December 30, 2018EXHIBIT Doc # 6 A NOTE
Date: December 30, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 9 ISSUED Party: AGRIPPA, MONICA L
Date: December 30, 2018COMPLAINT Doc # 5
Date: December 30, 2018PLAINTIFF-LENDER CONTACT INFORMATION SHEET Doc # 11 FORM D
Date: December 30, 2018ANSWER OF Doc # 15 Party: FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION
Date: January 18, 2019SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 10 ISSUED Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MONICA L AGRIPPA
Date: December 30, 2018NOTICE TO HOMEOWNER Doc # 12 FORM C
Date: December 30, 2018SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 13 010919 Party: AQUA FINANCE INC
Date: January 14, 2019SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 16 011819 Party: AGRIPPA, MONICA L
Date: January 24, 2019SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 14 010919 Party: FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION
Date: January 14, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 20
Judge: ST. ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 19 W/O PREJUDICE Vol./Book 20468, Page 1348, 2 pages
Judge: ST. ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 18
Judge: ST. ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 19W/O PREJUDICEVol./Book 20468, Page 1348, 2 pages | |
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 20 | |
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 18 | |
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED Doc # 17 011819 Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MONICA L AGRIPPA
Judge: ST. ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED Doc # 17011819Party: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MONICA L AGRIPPA | |
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED Doc # 16 011819 Party: AGRIPPA, MONICA L
Judge: ST. ARNOLD, JACK R |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 16 011819 Party: AGRIPPA, MONICA L
Judge: ST. ARNOLD, JACK R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.