Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Genzlinger, Dawn, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Ian Matthew Thomas, Esq, against Standard Fire Insurance Co, represented by Douglas C Saltarelli, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRAMSBERGER, THOMAS M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2018 |
CategoryInsurance Claims - Circuit |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Dawn Genzlinger against Standard Fire Insurance Co. The complaint seeks damages in excess of $15,000, exclusive of costs, attorney's fees, and interest. Dawn Genzlinger is a resident of Florida, while Standard Fire Insuranc...
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 5
Date: December 29, 2018NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 71 OF HEARING 06242020
Date: June 19, 2020AGREED ORDER Doc # 72 ON MOTION SET VIDEOCONFERENCE MEDIATION GRANTED/90 DAYS
Date: June 19, 2020STIPULATION Doc # 78 FOR DISMISSAL
Date: August 17, 2020MEDIATION REPORT Doc # 76
Date: July 17, 2020CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 73 PROPOSED ORDER
Date: June 19, 2020CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY Doc # 75
Date: July 08, 2020SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 8 ISSUED Party: STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE CO
Date: December 29, 2018REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 6
Date: December 29, 2018DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 7
Date: December 29, 2018EXHIBIT Doc # 4 B - CIVIL REMEDY NOTICE
Date: December 29, 2018EXHIBIT Doc # 3 A - DISCLOSURE OF INSURANCE INFORMATION
Date: December 29, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 1
Date: December 29, 2018COMPLAINT Doc # 2
Date: December 29, 2018NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM Doc # 9 SUMMONS ELECTRONIC DELIVERY ON 011119
Date: January 21, 2019DEFAULT ENTERED Doc # 11 Party: STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE CO
Date: February 04, 2019MOTION FOR DEFAULT Doc # 10 ENTERED Party: GENZLINGER, DAWN
Date: February 01, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 12 / EMAIL ADDRESS FOR COUNSEL OF Party: STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE CO
Date: February 15, 2019DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE Doc # 15 CLERK'S DEFAULT
Date: February 20, 2019AFFIDAVIT Doc # 14 OF ANDREW FINK
Date: February 20, 2019NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 13 AFFIDAVIT OF ANDREW FINK DATED FEBRUARY 20, 2019
Date: February 20, 2019JOINT STIPULATION Doc # 16 TO SET ASIDE / VACATE CLERKS DEFAULT
Date: February 21, 2019ORDER Doc # 17 SETTING ASIDE AND VACATING CLERKS DEFAULT AS TO STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE CO
Date: February 28, 2019REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 22
Date: March 19, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 21
Date: March 19, 2019DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS Doc # 20 AND STRIKE COUNT II OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: March 19, 2019ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Doc # 19 Party: STANDARD FIRE INSURANCE CO
Date: March 19, 2019RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 24
Date: April 15, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 25 042419 10:15
Date: April 17, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 26
Date: April 18, 2019ORDER DENYING Doc # 34 DEFT MOTN DISMISS COUNT II OF COMPLAINT
Date: May 07, 2019EXHIBIT Doc # 33 A - EMAIL REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER
Date: May 07, 2019CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 32 PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED BY COURT 050319
Date: May 07, 2019NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 31 050819
Date: May 08, 2019RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 30
Date: May 08, 2019NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Doc # 29
Date: May 08, 2019SUPPLEMENTAL Doc # 36 PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFT
Date: May 13, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 35
Date: May 09, 2019OBJECTION TO THE SUBPOENA Doc # 37
Date: May 16, 2019CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 39 PROPOSED ORDER
Date: May 23, 2019REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 38
Date: May 23, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 45
Date: July 15, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 44
Date: July 15, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 43
Date: July 15, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 42
Date: July 15, 2019SUPPLEMENTAL Doc # 47 PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFT (SECOND)
Date: July 18, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 41
Date: July 15, 2019SUPPLEMENTAL Doc # 48 (THIRD) PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFT
Date: August 01, 2019NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Doc # 46
Date: July 17, 2019EXHIBIT Doc # 54 B-EMAIL CORRESPONDENCE
Date: August 05, 2019EXHIBIT Doc # 53 A-LETTER OF REQUEST FOR MEDICAL RECORDS / RETURN MEDICAL AUTHORIZATION
Date: August 05, 2019SUPPLEMENTAL Doc # 51 (PLTF FOURTH) PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFT
Date: August 05, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 50 080919 9:45
Date: August 05, 2019SUPPLEMENTAL Doc # 55 PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (FIFTH)
Date: September 12, 2019NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Doc # 58
Date: September 16, 2019NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 57 091619
Date: September 16, 2019REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 56 AS TO DEFTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: September 16, 2019ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Doc # 60 FOR DEFT TO RESPOND TO PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: October 01, 2019CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 59 PROPOSED ORDER
Date: October 01, 2019SUPPLEMENTAL Doc # 62 PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SEVENTH)
Date: December 05, 2019SUPPLEMENTAL Doc # 61 (PLTF SIXTH) PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFT
Date: November 22, 2019NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 67 OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 05012020
Date: April 07, 2020NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 64 02122020
Date: February 12, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 70 06242020 2:30 TELEPHONIC
Date: May 22, 2020NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Doc # 63 05012020 9:00
Date: January 13, 2020NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 65 02122020
Date: February 12, 2020SUPPLEMENTAL Doc # 66 (EIGHTH) PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFT
Date: February 13, 2020PLTF-PET'S MOTION Doc # 68 TO SET VIDEOCONFERENCE MEDIATION
Date: May 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION Doc # 78 FOR DISMISSAL
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED-SETTLEMENT AFTER HRG (SRS DISPO) Doc # 77
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
MEDIATION REPORT Doc # 76
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY Doc # 75
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
AMENDED Doc # 74 NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 07162020 9:00 (ZOOM VIDEO-CONFERENCE)
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 71 OF HEARING 06242020
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER Doc # 72 ON MOTION SET VIDEOCONFERENCE MEDIATION GRANTED/90 DAYS
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 73 PROPOSED ORDER
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 70 06242020 2:30 TELEPHONIC
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT Doc # 69 A - EMAIL RE: GOOD MORNING MR. THOMAS - MR. SALTARELLI WOULD LIKE TO HAVE THE MEDIATION TAKE PLACE LIVE AND NOT VIA VIDEO
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.