Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Us Bank National Association Chase Funding Mortgage, Us Bank National Association  Chase Funding Mortgage, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Roy A Diaz, Roy A Diaz, Esq, against All Unknown Parties, Integrity Bail Bonds Inc, Moriarity, Barbara, Moriarity, Tom, Unknown Tenant No 1, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MEYER, KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMEYER, KEITH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure2 $50,001 - $249,999 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 1
Date: December 28, 2018SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 20 022519 Party: MORIARITY, TOM
Date: March 05, 2019SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 21 022519 Party: MORIARITY, BARBARA
Date: March 05, 2019SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 22 022719 Party: INTEGRITY BAIL BONDS INC
Date: March 05, 2019SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Doc # 23 Party: UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1
Date: March 05, 2019SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Doc # 24 Party: UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2
Date: March 05, 2019COMPLAINT Doc # 2 W/ EXHIBITS ATTACHED
Date: December 28, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 11 NOT ISSUED; MISSING FORM C
Date: December 28, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 10 NOT ISSUED; FORM C NEEDS TO BE FILED SEPARATELY
Date: December 28, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 9 NOT ISSUED; FORM C NEEDS TO BE FILED SEPARATELY
Date: December 28, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 8 NOT ISSUED; FORM C NEEDS TO BE FILED SEPARATELY
Date: December 28, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 7 NOT ISSUED; FORM C NEEDS TO BE FILED SEPARATELY
Date: December 28, 2018PLAINTIFF-LENDER CONTACT INFORMATION SHEET Doc # 4 FORM D
Date: December 28, 2018VALUE OF REAL PROP-MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM Doc # 6
Date: December 28, 2018FORM A-PLAINTIFF CERTIFICATE Doc # 5
Date: December 28, 2018NOTICE TO HOMEOWNER Doc # 12 FORM C
Date: January 29, 2019SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 17 ISSUED Party: INTEGRITY BAIL BONDS INC
Date: February 08, 2019SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 16 ISSUED Party: MORIARITY, BARBARA
Date: February 08, 2019SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 15 ISSUED Party: UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2
Date: February 08, 2019SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 14 ISSUED Party: UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1
Date: February 08, 2019SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 13 ISSUED Party: MORIARITY, TOM
Date: February 08, 2019NOTICE TO HOMEOWNER Doc # 19 FORM B
Date: February 12, 2019FORM A-PLAINTIFF CERTIFICATE Doc # 18 FORM A
Date: February 12, 2019AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 29 TOM MORIARITY
Date: March 12, 2020STATUS REPORT TO COURT Doc # 26
Date: March 04, 2020AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 28 BARBARA MORIARITY
Date: March 12, 2020NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE Doc # 32
Date: May 12, 2020SUMMONS - RETURNED NOT SERVED Doc # 24 Party: UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2
Date: March 05, 2019SUMMONS - RETURNED NOT SERVED Doc # 23 Party: UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1
Date: March 05, 2019SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED Doc # 22 022719 Party: INTEGRITY BAIL BONDS INC
Date: March 05, 2019SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED Doc # 21 022519 Party: MORIARITY, BARBARA
Date: March 05, 2019SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED Doc # 20 022519 Party: MORIARITY, TOM
Date: March 05, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Doc # 34 INTEGRITY BAIL BONDS INC / MORIARITY, TOM / MORIARITY, BARBARA Vol./Book 21607, Page 1316, 2 pages
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
CIVIL - CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MEYER, KEITH)
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 33
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE Doc # 32
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
April 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer MEYER, KEITH) CURRENT ACTIVITY
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Doc # 31 Party: INTEGRITY BAIL BONDS INC Party: MORIARITY, BARBARA Party: MORIARITY, TOM
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 29 TOM MORIARITY
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING Doc # 30 W/ ATTACHMENTS Party: ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES Party: UNKNOWN TENANT NO 1 Party: UNKNOWN TENANT NO 2
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 28 BARBARA MORIARITY
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.