Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Martinez, Baltazar, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Eduardo R Latour, Esq, against Tischio, Ellen Marie, represented by Matthew Wallace Tucy, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JIROTKA, GEORGE M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJIROTKA, GEORGE M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Baltazar Martinez against Ellen Marie Tischio in the Circuit Court of the Sixth Judicial Circuit in Pinellas County, Florida. The complaint alleges that on August 7, 2015, at the intersection of Tampa Rd. and U.S. Hwy. 19 i...
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 22
Date: November 05, 2019COPY Doc # 20 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE
Date: October 30, 2019STIPULATION Doc # 19 FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: September 06, 2019ORDER OF DISMISSAL Doc # 21 W/PREJUDICE Vol./Book 20763, Page 346, 1 pages
Date: November 05, 2019NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 17 071019
Date: July 10, 2019RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 14
Date: April 29, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 16 AND REQUEST PRODUCTION
Date: May 14, 2019ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Doc # 7 Party: TISCHIO, ELLEN MARIE
Date: January 31, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 6 Party: TISCHIO, ELLEN MARIE
Date: January 31, 2019REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 9
Date: January 31, 2019PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Doc # 13 TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY
Date: April 16, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 8
Date: January 31, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 10
Date: April 12, 2019AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS Doc # 4 011019 Party: TISCHIO, ELLEN MARIE
Date: January 16, 2019COMPLAINT Doc # 2
Date: December 28, 2018REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 11
Date: April 12, 2019NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Doc # 12
Date: April 12, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 1
Date: December 28, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 15
Date: April 29, 2019SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 3 ISSUED Party: TISCHIO, ELLEN MARIE
Date: December 28, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 22
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL Doc # 21 W/PREJUDICE Vol./Book 20763, Page 346, 1 pages
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL Doc # 21W/PREJUDICEVol./Book 20763, Page 346, 1 pages | |
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 22 | |
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
COPY Doc # 20 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event | COPY Doc # 20STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION Doc # 19 FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 18
Judge: JIROTKA, GEORGE M |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION Doc # 19FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.