Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Petitioner, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Yerbafria-Barquera, Patricio, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with COVERT, THANE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2018 |
CategoryDomestic - Sexual Violence |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE Doc # 18 COPY ORDER OF DISMISSAL TEMPORARY INJUNCTION
Judge: COVERT, THANE |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION Doc # 17 Vol./Book 20322, Page 2238, 1 pages
Judge: COVERT, THANE |
|
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC INJUNCTION - SEXUAL VIOLENCE (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officers MEYER, KEITH, MEYER, KEITH)
Judge: COVERT, THANE |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Doc # 16 NON SERVED ORDER EXTENDING INJUNCTION
Judge: COVERT, THANE |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
TEXT Doc # 14 FROM CLERK-LOOK TO NOTES
Judge: COVERT, THANE |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER EXTENDING INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION Doc # 15 102518 2:30
Judge: COVERT, THANE |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC INJUNCTION - SEXUAL VIOLENCE (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officers MEYER, KEITH, MEYER, KEITH)
Judge: COVERT, THANE |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Doc # 13 NON SERVED INJUNCTION
Judge: COVERT, THANE |
|
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM TO OUT OF COUNTY SHERIFF Doc # 11 HILLSBOROUGH
Judge: COVERT, THANE |
|
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC INJUNCTION - SEXUAL VIOLENCE (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officers MEYER, KEITH, MEYER, KEITH)
Judge: COVERT, THANE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.