Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Autovest Financial Services Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Jorge L Palma, Esq, against Oneill, Mary Margaret, represented by Michael A Ziegler, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KELLY, LORRAINE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2018 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Autovest Financial Services LLC against Mary Margaret O'Neill. Autovest Financial Services LLC is seeking damages from O'Neill for a defaulted Retail Installment Sale Contract. Autovest Financial Services LLC is the assigne...
CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 4
Date: July 31, 2018EXHIBIT Doc # 2 B- BILL OF SALE AND ASSIGNMENT
Date: July 31, 2018ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME Doc # 10 (AGREED) TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT - 30 DAYS
Date: September 04, 2018NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE Doc # 5
Date: July 31, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 3 ISSUED Party: ONEILL, MARY MARGARET
Date: July 31, 2018REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 13
Date: September 13, 2018COMPLAINT Doc # 1 FOR DAMAGES
Date: July 31, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 12
Date: September 13, 2018ATTACHMENT Doc # 7 SUMMONS
Date: August 09, 2018REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Doc # 15
Date: September 13, 2018REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 14
Date: September 13, 2018ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Doc # 11 Party: ONEILL, MARY MARGARET
Date: September 11, 2018SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO Doc # 18 MARY MARGARET ONEILL / 18-BK-10108
Date: November 27, 2018DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Doc # 9 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: August 24, 2018AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS Doc # 6 080718 Party: ONEILL, MARY MARGARET
Date: August 09, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 8 Party: ONEILL, MARY MARGARET
Date: August 24, 2018PLTF-PET'S MOTION Doc # 19 TO STAY ACTION PENDING DISCHARGE IN BANKRUPTCY
Date: November 28, 2018ORDER Doc # 20 STAYING ACTION PENDING ENTRY OF DISCHARGE IN BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDING
Date: November 30, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 22 W/O PREJUDICE BY Party: AUTOVEST FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 21
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER Doc # 20 STAYING ACTION PENDING ENTRY OF DISCHARGE IN BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDING
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Doc # 19 TO STAY ACTION PENDING DISCHARGE IN BANKRUPTCY
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO Doc # 18 MARY MARGARET ONEILL / 18-BK-10108
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER Doc # 17 GRANTING DEFTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLTFS DISCOVERY REQUEST --- 30 DAYS
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Doc # 16 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 13
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 12
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Doc # 15
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.