Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Grow Financial Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Jeffrey J Mouch, Esq, against Grgic, Dijana, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2018 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES Doc # 33
Date: June 01, 2020PLTF-PET'S MOTION Doc # 40 FOR FINAL ORDER OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT
Date: October 23, 2020NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES Doc # 37 SECOND
Date: August 28, 2020EXHIBIT Doc # 26 A - ANSWER OF GARNISHEE
Date: September 09, 2019ORDER Doc # 27 FINAL OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT
Date: September 12, 2019SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 6 ISSUED Party: GRGIC, DIJANA
Date: July 31, 2018EXHIBIT Doc # 5 C- EXPLANTION OF CALCULATION OF SURPLUS OR DEFICIENCY
Date: July 31, 2018AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS Doc # 10 090618 Party: GRGIC, DIJANA
Date: October 08, 2018PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 12
Date: April 03, 2019NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES Doc # 20
Date: July 16, 2019NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES Doc # 23 (SECOND)
Date: August 09, 2019PLTF-PET'S MOTION Doc # 25 FOR FINAL ORDER OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT
Date: September 09, 2019SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (R) Doc # 45 Vol./Book 21628, Page 2394, 1 pages
Date: July 14, 2021EXHIBIT Doc # 4 B- NOTICE OF OUR PLAN TO SELL PROPERTY
Date: July 31, 2018ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Doc # 8
Date: October 01, 2018AFFIDAVIT Doc # 13 OF NON-PAYMENT
Date: April 03, 2019CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT SALARY-WAGES Doc # 18
Date: June 26, 2019ANSWER OF GARNISHEE Doc # 21 PERKINS AND MARIE CALLENDERS LLC
Date: August 05, 2019AFFIDAVIT Doc # 22 OF SERVICE OF CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: August 06, 2019ORDER Doc # 43 (FINAL) OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT
Date: October 27, 2020CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT Doc # 31 POLLO OPERATIONS INC DBA POLLO TROPICAL
Date: March 16, 2020AFFIDAVIT Doc # 34 OF SERVICE OF CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT
Date: August 10, 2020CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 41 PROPOSED ORDER
Date: October 23, 2020NOTICE Doc # 44 OF DISMISSAL OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: June 24, 2021COMPLAINT Doc # 2
Date: July 31, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 1
Date: July 31, 2018STIPULATION Doc # 7 FOR PAYMENTS / TO WITHHOLD JUDGMENT
Date: September 25, 2018STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT Doc # 9
Date: October 01, 2018FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 14 IN FAVOR OF PLTF Vol./Book 20499, Page 1951, 2 pages
Date: April 09, 2019ANSWER OF GARNISHEE Doc # 36 FIESTA
Date: August 24, 2020CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING Doc # 15
Date: May 08, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT (R) Doc # 45 Vol./Book 21628, Page 2394, 1 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Doc # 44 OF DISMISSAL OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER Doc # 43 (FINAL) OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED Doc # 42
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Doc # 40 FOR FINAL ORDER OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 41 PROPOSED ORDER
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED Doc # 39
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Doc # 38 ATTACHED NOTICE TO DEFT AND SECOND NOTICE TO DEFT W/ATTACHMENT Party: GRGIC, DIJANA
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
August 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO DEF & INTERESTED PARTIES Doc # 37 SECOND
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF GARNISHEE Doc # 36 FIESTA
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.