Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rodgers Forest Creek Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Michael George F Davis, against Allen, Brandy, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2018 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is a residential eviction case filed by Rodgers Forest Creek LLC against Brandy Allen, also known as Brandy N. Allen. The plaintiff is the landlord of Forest Creek Apartments located at 13500 Rodgers Avenue, Apt 1104, Largo, FL 33771. ...
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 5 ISSUED Party: ALLEN, BRANDY
Date: July 31, 2018CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Doc # 6 Party: ALLEN, BRANDY
Date: August 02, 2018WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 16 RETD EXECUTED
Date: September 10, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 4
Date: July 31, 2018EXHIBIT Doc # 3 B - THREE DAY NOTICE
Date: July 31, 2018EXHIBIT Doc # 2 A - LEASE CONTRACT
Date: July 31, 2018COMPLAINT - 1 COUNT Doc # 1
Date: July 31, 2018SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 11 080318 Party: ALLEN, BRANDY
Date: August 14, 2018PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 10
Date: August 14, 2018PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Doc # 9 ENTERED
Date: August 14, 2018DEFAULT ENTERED Doc # 12 Party: ALLEN, BRANDY
Date: August 15, 2018VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 8
Date: August 14, 2018FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 7
Date: August 14, 2018WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 15 ISSUED
Date: August 24, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 16 RETD EXECUTED
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 15 ISSUED
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Doc # 14 IN FAVOR OF PLTF Vol./Book 20179, Page 1696, 1 pages
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Doc # 13
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Doc # 12 Party: ALLEN, BRANDY
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 11 080318 Party: ALLEN, BRANDY
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 10
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Doc # 9 ENTERED
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 8
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 7
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.