Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Chiropractic And Acupuncture Medical Center, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by T Roger White Jr, Esq, against National General Insurance Company, represented by Hector Muniz, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2018 |
CategorySmall Claims Pip 2 - $100 - $500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
OBJECTION Doc # 44 TO PLTFS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: May 23, 2019PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Doc # 51
Date: January 27, 2020PLTF-PET'S AMENDED MOTION Doc # 53 FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 03, 2020NOTICE OF GOOD CAUSE Doc # 52 NOT TO DISMISS
Date: January 27, 2020RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 48 (EXPERT)
Date: June 19, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 47
Date: June 10, 2019PLTF-PET'S MOTION IN LIMINE Doc # 35 REGARDING DEFENSE OF NO INJURY, ETC
Date: May 20, 2019NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 45 OF DEPO
Date: May 29, 2019PLTF-PET'S MOTION IN LIMINE Doc # 36 REGARDING OBLIGATION TO PAY BILLS
Date: May 20, 2019PLTF-PET'S MOTION IN LIMINE Doc # 54 AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: August 03, 2020NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 56 WITH PREJUDICE
Date: November 11, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 56 WITH PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
November 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 55
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION IN LIMINE Doc # 54 AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
April 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S AMENDED MOTION Doc # 53 FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN) CURRENT ACTIVITY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Doc # 51
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF GOOD CAUSE Doc # 52 NOT TO DISMISS
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 50
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 48 (EXPERT)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 49 RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESS INTERROGATORIES
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.