Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Grace, Kerri, Grace, Shon, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Christopher M Palermo, Christopher M Palermo, Esq, against Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company, represented by Fredric S Zinober, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with COVERT, THANE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2018 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - Circuit |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Kerri Grace and Shon Grace against Tower Hill Prime Insurance Company. The plaintiffs allege that they owned a property located at 1212 E. Lake Drive, Tarpon Springs, Florida, which was covered by a policy issued by Tower H...
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 4
Date: July 31, 2018REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Doc # 10 BY PLTF
Date: September 20, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 5
Date: July 31, 2018ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Doc # 9 Party: TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: September 10, 2018ORDER Doc # 22 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 080619 10:30
Date: January 25, 2019RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 11
Date: October 05, 2018NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Doc # 17 011519 1:00
Date: October 29, 2018NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL Doc # 21 DID NOT REACH AGREEMENT
Date: January 22, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 15 012519 9:30
Date: October 23, 2018NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL Doc # 13 JURY
Date: October 15, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 1
Date: July 31, 2018CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 16 HEARING - RECEIVED BY COURT 102618
Date: October 29, 2018REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 3
Date: July 31, 2018NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 19
Date: November 08, 2018CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY Doc # 20
Date: January 11, 2019OBJECTION Doc # 14 TO PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE FOR TRIAL
Date: October 22, 2018COMPLAINT Doc # 2 AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: July 31, 2018AGREED ORDER Doc # 29 ON STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE
Date: June 24, 2019JOINT STIPULATION Doc # 27 FOR DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE
Date: June 19, 2019NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Doc # 25
Date: February 22, 2019NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Doc # 24
Date: February 22, 2019RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE Doc # 23 COPY NOTICE OF FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL
Date: January 29, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER Doc # 29 ON STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE
Judge: COVERT, THANE |
|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 28 PROPOSED ORDER
Judge: COVERT, THANE |
|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 28PROPOSED ORDER | |
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER Doc # 29ON STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE | |
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 26
Judge: COVERT, THANE |
|
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION Doc # 27 FOR DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE
Judge: COVERT, THANE |
|
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 26 | |
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION Doc # 27FOR DISMISSAL W/ PREJUDICE | |
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Doc # 25
Judge: COVERT, THANE |
|
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Doc # 24
Judge: COVERT, THANE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.