Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Creekside Clearwater Llc, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Bradford L Stewart, Esq, against Scottsdale Insurance Company, represented by Kristina L Marsh, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 02, 2018 |
CategoryInsurance Claims - Circuit |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
This complaint is filed by Creekside Clearwater, LLC against Scottsdale Insurance Company in the Circuit Court of Pinellas County, Florida. The plaintiff is seeking damages in the amount of $66,777.74, excluding attorneys' fees, costs, and interest. ...
ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Doc # 18 W/ATTACHED EXHIBITS Party: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: September 05, 2018REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 5
Date: May 02, 2018NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 15 OF HEARING 090418
Date: August 22, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 12 090418 10:30
Date: June 05, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 2 ISSUED Party: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: May 02, 2018REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 6
Date: May 02, 2018PRIVILEGE LOG Doc # 13 DEFENDANT'S
Date: June 22, 2018NOTICE Doc # 8 OF SERVICE OF CORRESPONDENCE
Date: May 02, 2018COMPLAINT Doc # 3
Date: May 02, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 14
Date: June 22, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 1
Date: May 02, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 4
Date: May 02, 2018DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 7
Date: May 02, 2018FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 23
Date: February 18, 2019SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED Doc # 9 050718 Party: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: May 07, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 22 W/ PREJUDICE BY Party: CREEKSIDE CLEARWATER LLC
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
February 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 23
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
February 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 21
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
February 18, 2019 | Docket Event | (NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 22W/ PREJUDICE BYParty: CREEKSIDE CLEARWATER LLC | |
February 18, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 23 | |
February 18, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 21 | |
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 19 PROPOSED ORDER - RECEIVED BY COURT 090418
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER Doc # 20 CANCELLING 090418 HEARING
Judge: MUSCARELLA, PATRICIA ANN |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 19PROPOSED ORDER - RECEIVED BY COURT 090418 | |
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER Doc # 20CANCELLING 090418 HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.