Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa N A, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Flynn Lavrar, Esq, against Nelson, Sandra M, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims 4 - $2,501 - $5,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 12 WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: June 26, 2018ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT Doc # 2 ACCOUNT SUMMARY
Date: December 29, 2017NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Doc # 7
Date: January 04, 2018SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Doc # 8 Party: NELSON, SANDRA M
Date: January 04, 2018NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Doc # 6 Party: NELSON, SANDRA M
Date: January 04, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 5 NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: December 29, 2017STATEMENT OF CLAIM Doc # 1
Date: December 29, 2017NOTICE Doc # 4 NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY
Date: December 29, 2017NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE Doc # 3
Date: December 29, 2017NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED Doc # 10 Party: NELSON, SANDRA M
Date: February 07, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 12 WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 11
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED Doc # 10 Party: NELSON, SANDRA M
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SERVICE Doc # 9
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Doc # 7
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Doc # 8 Party: NELSON, SANDRA M
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Doc # 6 Party: NELSON, SANDRA M
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT Doc # 2 ACCOUNT SUMMARY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 5 NOT USED BY CLERK
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.