Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa N A, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Flynn Lavrar, Esq, against Miller, Tracy S, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Doc # 7
Date: January 03, 2018ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT Doc # 2 ACCOUNT STATEMENTS
Date: December 29, 2017SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Date: February 13, 2018SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Doc # 8 Party: MILLER, TRACY S
Date: January 03, 2018NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Doc # 6 Party: MILLER, TRACY S
Date: January 03, 2018STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT Doc # 10 Vol./Book 19944, Page 134, 1 pages
Date: February 13, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 5 NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: December 29, 2017NOTICE Doc # 4 OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY
Date: December 29, 2017NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE Doc # 3
Date: December 29, 2017STATEMENT OF CLAIM Doc # 1
Date: December 29, 2017NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Doc # 9
Date: February 12, 2018STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Doc # 11 FOR PLAINTIFF
Date: November 08, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Doc # 11 FOR PLAINTIFF
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION-ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT Doc # 10 Vol./Book 19944, Page 134, 1 pages
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Doc # 9
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Doc # 7
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Doc # 8 Party: MILLER, TRACY S
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Doc # 6 Party: MILLER, TRACY S
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT Doc # 2 ACCOUNT STATEMENTS
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 5 NOT USED BY CLERK
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE Doc # 4 OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.