Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Flynn Lavrar, Esq, against Cramer, Chris D, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims 4 - $2,501 - $5,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Doc # 21 PLTF-W/ATTACHED AFFIDAVIT EXHIBIT A
Date: November 09, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Doc # 21 PLTF-W/ATTACHED AFFIDAVIT EXHIBIT A
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Doc # 20 CRAMER, CHRIS D Vol./Book 20544, Page 945, 9 pages
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 19
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
May 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. Doc # 18 UNKNOWN ADDRESS FOR DEFT CHRIS D CRAMER
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 17
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
ALIAS NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED Doc # 15 Party: CRAMER, CHRIS D
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SERVICE Doc # 16
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
ALIAS NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Doc # 12
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.