Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Flynn Lavrar, Esq, against Sasser, Paula K, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
NOTICE Doc # 4 OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY
Date: December 29, 2017NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE Doc # 3
Date: December 29, 2017ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT Doc # 2 SUMMARY OF ACCOUNT
Date: December 29, 2017SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Doc # 8 Party: SASSER, PAULA K
Date: January 03, 2018SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Date: February 13, 2018NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Doc # 6 Party: SASSER, PAULA K
Date: January 03, 2018NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Doc # 7
Date: January 03, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 5 NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: December 29, 2017STATEMENT OF CLAIM Doc # 1
Date: December 29, 2017NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Doc # 9
Date: February 07, 2018NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 14 SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 27, 2018COPY Doc # 13 MILITARY STATUS AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 27, 2018CERTIFICATE Doc # 12 OF TAXABLE COSTS
Date: March 27, 2018PLTF-PET'S MOTION Doc # 11 FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: March 27, 2018SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO Doc # 17 Party: SASSER, PAULA K
Date: April 12, 2018(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 18 WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: April 19, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 18 WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY AS TO Doc # 17 Party: SASSER, PAULA K
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 16 $2012.84 PRIN $191.48 COSTS Vol./Book 20001, Page 2636, 1 pages
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Doc # 15
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 14 SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
COPY Doc # 13 MILITARY STATUS AFFIDAVIT
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE Doc # 12 OF TAXABLE COSTS
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION Doc # 11 FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT-JUDGMENT UPON RECEIPT OF Doc # 10 AFFDS IN PROOF OF COST, STATEMENT OF PRINCIPAL
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.