Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Flynn Lavrar, Esq, against Fletcher, Anatalia E, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims 4 - $2,501 - $5,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT Doc # 18 ISSUED - GREEN DOT BANK
Date: September 06, 2018STATEMENT OF CLAIM Doc # 1
Date: December 29, 2017SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Date: February 13, 2018NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 13 ATTACHED SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 27, 2018ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT Doc # 2 SUMMARY OF ACCOUNT
Date: December 29, 2017SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Doc # 8 Party: FLETCHER, ANATALIA E
Date: January 03, 2018NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Doc # 7
Date: January 03, 2018NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Doc # 6 Party: FLETCHER, ANATALIA E
Date: January 03, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 5 NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: December 29, 2017NOTICE Doc # 4 OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY
Date: December 29, 2017NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE Doc # 3
Date: December 29, 2017NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Doc # 9
Date: February 07, 2018CERTIFICATE Doc # 11 OF TAXABLE COSTS
Date: March 27, 2018AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 12
Date: March 27, 2018(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 19 OF GARNISHMENT
Date: October 25, 2018MOTION-REQUEST FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT Doc # 17 GREEN DOT BANK GARNISHEE
Date: September 06, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 20 Party: CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA
Date: November 27, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 20 Party: CAPITAL ONE BANK USA NA
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 19 OF GARNISHMENT
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT Doc # 18 ISSUED - GREEN DOT BANK
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION-REQUEST FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT Doc # 17 GREEN DOT BANK GARNISHEE
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING Doc # 16
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT Doc # 15 $2947.21 PRIN $320.85 COSTS Vol./Book 20002, Page 847, 1 pages
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Doc # 14
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 13 ATTACHED SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE Doc # 11 OF TAXABLE COSTS
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 12
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.