Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with Edwin B. Jagger presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Doc # 6
Date: January 03, 2018AFFIDAVIT Doc # 12 OF INTEREST
Date: February 07, 2018AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS Doc # 11
Date: February 07, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 3 NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: December 29, 2017ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Doc # 14
Date: February 12, 2018NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Doc # 5 Party: ROBINSON, QUINNISHA TEQUITTA
Date: January 03, 2018SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Doc # 7 Party: ROBINSON, QUINNISHA TEQUITTA
Date: January 03, 2018STATEMENT OF CLAIM Doc # 1
Date: December 29, 2017DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 4
Date: December 29, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 2
Date: December 29, 2017AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 13 NON-MILITARY
Date: February 07, 2018NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Doc # 8
Date: January 22, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS Doc # 10
Date: February 07, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING Doc # 17
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
ATTORNEY COVER LETTER Doc # 14
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT Doc # 16 $2087.15 PRIN $122.94 INT $354.50 COSTS Vol./Book 19942, Page 1364, 1 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Doc # 15
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Doc # 12 OF INTEREST
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS Doc # 11
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 13 NON-MILITARY
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS Doc # 10
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT-JUDGMENT UPON RECEIPT OF Doc # 9 AFFDS IN PROOF OF CLAIM, COST, INTEREST
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.