Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gomez, Pedro Orlando, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against La Fe, Yolexis, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MEYER, KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2017 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Injunction Without Kids |
Last RefreshedJanuary 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 21
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION W/OUT CHILDREN (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officers MEYER, KEITH, MEYER, KEITH)
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION-DOM VIOLENCE Doc # 20 020119 Vol./Book 19931, Page 2370, 7 pages
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION W/OUT CHILDREN (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officers MEYER, KEITH, MEYER, KEITH) DATA ENTRY ERROR
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
SWORN STATEMENT OF POSSESSION OF FIREARMS ETC Doc # 18 Party: LA FE, YOLEXIS
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT Doc # 19 (PETITIONER EX #1: STATEMENT OF WITNESS FOR PETITIONER)
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Doc # 17 OF SERVICE OF INJUNCTION
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED COPY Doc # 16 ORDER SETTING NOT SERVED
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM TO OUT OF COUNTY SHERIFF Doc # 14 HILLSBOROUGH ON ORDER SETTING
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
TEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITHOUT NOTICE Doc # 11
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.