Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
R And B Auto Body Transport Refinishing Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Benjamin G Deberg, Esq, against Alexanders Property Maintenance Inc, represented by Philip G Dragonetti, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KELLY, LORRAINE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is an amended complaint for breach of a written contract. The plaintiff, R & B Auto Body Transport Refinishing, LLC, is suing the defendant, Alexanders Property Maintenance, Inc., for damages in excess of $5,000.00, but not more than $...
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO SET TRIAL Doc # 16 JURY
Date: October 12, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 3
Date: December 29, 2017SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 2 ISSUED Party: ALEXANDERS PROPERTY MAINTENANCE INC
Date: December 29, 2017COMPLAINT Doc # 1 WITH ATTACHMENTS
Date: December 29, 2017AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS Doc # 4 010518 Party: ALEXANDERS PROPERTY MAINTENANCE INC
Date: January 16, 2018DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS Doc # 6 BASED ON STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS
Date: January 25, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 5 Party: ALEXANDERS PROPERTY MAINTENANCE INC
Date: January 25, 2018RESPONSE Doc # 8 TO DEFTS MOTN TO DISMISS
Date: February 09, 2018AMENDED COMPLAINT Doc # 7 W/ATTACHMENTS
Date: February 09, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 11
Date: February 27, 2018REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Doc # 10
Date: February 27, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 12 UN-VERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 17, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 13
Date: April 24, 2018NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 14
Date: July 17, 2018REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 17
Date: October 15, 2018RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 18 BY DEFT
Date: November 14, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 19 010819 2:30
Date: December 14, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 21
Date: January 02, 2019REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 20
Date: January 02, 2019NOTICE Doc # 22 OF NON-JURY TRIAL 041019 9:00
Date: January 08, 2019ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Doc # 23 - PRIVATE
Date: January 17, 2019NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Doc # 24 022119 1:30
Date: February 12, 2019CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY Doc # 27 BY PLTF
Date: February 15, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 26
Date: February 15, 2019RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 25
Date: February 15, 2019STIPULATION Doc # 30 OF THE PARTIES FOR PAYMENT
Date: February 28, 2019PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY Doc # 28
Date: February 19, 2019NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL Doc # 29 --- SETTLED
Date: February 28, 2019FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 33
Date: April 18, 2019NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 32
Date: April 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 33
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 32
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED-SETTLEMENT AFTER HRG (SRS DISPO) Doc # 31
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION Doc # 30 OF THE PARTIES FOR PAYMENT
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FINAL DISPOSITION OF REFERRAL Doc # 29 --- SETTLED
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY Doc # 28
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY Doc # 27 BY PLTF
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 26
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 25
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Doc # 24 022119 1:30
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.