Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Wentworth Property Owners Association Inc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Jessica C Burley, against Montesano, James, Montesano, Rosana, represented by Matthew D Weidner, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryOther Real Property - County |
Last RefreshedMarch 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is a foreclosure complaint filed by the Wentworth Property Owners Association, Inc. against James Montesano and Rosana Montesano. The association is seeking to foreclose a claim of lien for homeowner association assessments in accordan...
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 3 ISSUED Party: MONTESANO, ROSANA
Date: December 28, 2017EXHIBIT Doc # 6 A - DECLARATION OF COVENANTS CONDITIONS AND RESTRICTIONS
Date: December 28, 2017REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS Doc # 8 ISSUED Party: MONTESANO, JAMES
Date: September 25, 2018REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS Doc # 7 ISSUED Party: MONTESANO, ROSANA
Date: September 25, 2018COMPLAINT Doc # 5 FOR FORECLOSURE
Date: December 28, 2017SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 2 ISSUED Party: MONTESANO, JAMES
Date: December 28, 2017AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY Doc # 9 Party: MONTESANO, JAMES
Date: January 16, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY Doc # 10 Party: MONTESANO, JAMES
Date: January 16, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 1
Date: December 28, 2017AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY Doc # 11 Party: MONTESANO, ROSANA
Date: January 31, 2019CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Doc # 17 NOTICE OF ACTION Party: MONTESANO, ROSANA
Date: January 31, 2019NOTICE OF ACTION Doc # 12 ISSUED Party: MONTESANO, JAMES
Date: January 31, 2019PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT Doc # 21 30 DAYS
Date: February 15, 2019NOTICE OF ACTION Doc # 15 ISSUED Party: MONTESANO, ROSANA
Date: January 31, 2019CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Doc # 14 NOTICE OF ACTION Party: MONTESANO, JAMES
Date: January 31, 2019PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT Doc # 18 30 DAYS
Date: February 15, 2019PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT Doc # 20 30 DAYS
Date: February 15, 2019PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT Doc # 19 30 DAYS
Date: February 15, 2019DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO DISMISS Doc # 23
Date: February 28, 2019ORDER DENYING Doc # 25 DEFTS MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: May 08, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 24 050719 10:30
Date: April 18, 2019NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 27 ATTACHED FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: May 31, 2019CERTIFICATE Doc # 28 OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 31, 2019NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 37 ATTACHED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: August 09, 2019PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY Doc # 30
Date: August 08, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 35
Date: August 09, 2019NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 33 ATTACHED FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: August 09, 2019NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL Doc # 36 OF PLTFS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Date: August 09, 2019NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 34 SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 09, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 32
Date: August 09, 2019DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW Doc # 29 AS COUNSEL
Date: August 07, 2019NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 39 ATTACHED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: August 16, 2019NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL Doc # 40 OF MTN WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
Date: October 28, 2019PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Doc # 41
Date: October 29, 2019NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 38 RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: August 16, 2019AFFIDAVIT Doc # 45 OF JAMES MONTESANO
Date: February 20, 2020FEES DUE LETTER FROM CLERK Doc # 48 $49 SERVICE CHARGE FEE (EMAILED 3/2/2020)
Date: March 02, 2020NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 42 OF COMPOSITE OF AFFIDAVITS BY PLTF
Date: December 19, 2019NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 44 DEFTS AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 20, 2020NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 49 (ONLINE) ***ESF PAID***
Date: March 03, 2020FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE Doc # 47 Vol./Book 20905, Page 62, 5 pages
Date: February 27, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 43 022620 3:00
Date: December 27, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 54 4/01/2020 10:00 (TELEPHONIC)
Date: March 27, 2020PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 50 /LA GACETA
Date: March 13, 2020ORDER RESCHEDULE ONLINE SALE Doc # 57 5/18/2020
Date: April 02, 2020NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 60 ***ESF PAID***
Date: April 03, 2020PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 53
Date: March 13, 2020FEES DUE LETTER FROM CLERK Doc # 58 $49 SERIVICE CHARGE FEE (EMAILED 4/3/2020)
Date: April 03, 2020NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 59 (ON-LINE)
Date: April 03, 2020PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 61 /LA GACETA
Date: April 17, 2020ORDER RESCHEDULE ONLINE SALE Doc # 69 07/02/2020
Date: May 15, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 67 05152020 10:00 TELEPHONIC
Date: May 12, 2020ORDER CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALE Doc # 74 7/2/2020
Date: June 12, 2020NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE Doc # 75
Date: May 17, 2021FEES DUE LETTER FROM CLERK Doc # 70 $49 SERVICE CHARGE FEE -RCVD 7/27/2020
Date: May 18, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE Doc # 75
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
CANCELED JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) ORDER FROM COURT CANCELLED PER JUDGE JAGGER
Judge: ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL |
|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE Doc # 72 SCHEDULED FOR JULY 2, 2020
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER CANCELLING FORECLOSURE SALE Doc # 74 7/2/2020
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED Doc # 73
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED Doc # 71
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
FEES DUE LETTER FROM CLERK Doc # 70 $49 SERVICE CHARGE FEE -RCVD 7/27/2020
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
CANCELED JUDICIAL ONLINE SALE (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL) OTHER PER EXECUTIVE ORDER 20-121
Judge: ONLINE SALE, JUDICIAL |
|
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER RESCHEDULE ONLINE SALE Doc # 69 07/02/2020
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
REOPEN - CLOSED Doc # 68
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.