Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Black Point Assets Inc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Michael George F Davis, against Murdock, Jaime, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is a residential eviction case filed by Black Point Assets, Inc., as Trustee through its agent Federal Housing Management, Inc., against Jaime Murdock. The Plaintiff is seeking to evict the Defendant from a property located at 5756 Cal...
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 4 ISSUED Party: MURDOCK, JAIME
Date: December 28, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 5
Date: December 28, 2017ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT Doc # 3 LEASE AGREEMENT
Date: December 28, 2017ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT Doc # 2 THREE DAY NOTICE
Date: December 28, 2017COMPLAINT - 1 COUNT Doc # 1 RESIDENTIAL EVICTION
Date: December 28, 2017CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Doc # 6 Party: MURDOCK, JAIME
Date: December 29, 2017SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 11 010218 Party: MURDOCK, JAIME
Date: January 10, 2018MOTION FOR DEFAULT Doc # 10 ENTERED
Date: January 10, 2018MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 9
Date: January 10, 2018VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 8
Date: January 10, 2018FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 7
Date: January 10, 2018DEFAULT ENTERED Doc # 12 Party: MURDOCK, JAIME
Date: January 12, 2018FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Doc # 14 Vol./Book 19919, Page 253, 1 pages
Date: January 23, 2018WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 15 ISSUED
Date: January 30, 2018WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 16 RETD UNEXECUTED
Date: February 14, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 16 RETD UNEXECUTED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 15 ISSUED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Doc # 14 Vol./Book 19919, Page 253, 1 pages
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Doc # 13
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Doc # 12 Party: MURDOCK, JAIME
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 11 010218 Party: MURDOCK, JAIME
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT Doc # 10 ENTERED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 9
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 8
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 7
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.