Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dija, Selim, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Boutabba, Fady, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2017 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF Doc # 6 Party: BOUTABBA, FADY
Date: December 21, 2017CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Doc # 7 Party: BOUTABBA, FADY
Date: December 21, 2017ATTACHMENT Doc # 4 THREE DAY NOTICE
Date: December 21, 2017AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 5
Date: December 21, 2017AUTHORIZATION TO REPRESENT Doc # 3 PROPERTY MANAGER
Date: December 21, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 2
Date: December 21, 2017COMPLAINT - 1 COUNT Doc # 1
Date: December 21, 2017PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 9 COUNT 1
Date: December 29, 2017PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Doc # 8 ENTERED
Date: December 29, 2017RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE Doc # 10 SUMMONS / COMPLAINT / CERT OF MAILING PACKET
Date: January 02, 2018SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED Doc # 12 010318 Party: BOUTABBA, FADY
Date: January 08, 2018DEFAULT ENTERED Doc # 13 COUNT 1 Party: BOUTABBA, FADY
Date: January 11, 2018FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 15
Date: January 17, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Doc # 17 IN FAVOR OF PLTF Vol./Book 19912, Page 639, 1 pages
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Doc # 16
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 15
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
UNSIGNED ORDER SENT TO JUDGE Doc # 14 FJ W/ ENVS
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Doc # 13 COUNT 1 Party: BOUTABBA, FADY
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED Doc # 12 010318 Party: BOUTABBA, FADY
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
RETURNED FROM POST OFFICE Doc # 10 SUMMONS / COMPLAINT / CERT OF MAILING PACKET
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 9 COUNT 1
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Doc # 8 ENTERED
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF Doc # 6 Party: BOUTABBA, FADY
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.