Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Joseph F Rosen, Esq, against Boschi, Alma D, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2017 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
This complaint is filed by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. against Alma D Bosch for damages. Capital One Bank is a national banking association authorized to do business in Florida, while Alma D Bosch is an individual and resident of Pinellas County, Fl...
COMPLAINT Doc # 1 WITH ATTACHMENT
Date: December 20, 2017ANSWER OF Doc # 7 Party: BOSCHI, ALMA D
Date: January 26, 2018CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE Doc # 9 WOULD LIKE AGREEMENT TO PAYMENTS BY DEFT
Date: March 19, 2018ANSWER OF Doc # 8 AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL W/ATTACHED COPY SUMMONS Party: BOSCHI, ALMA D
Date: February 15, 2018DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 3
Date: December 20, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 4
Date: December 20, 2017SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE Doc # 11
Date: April 23, 2019SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 2 ISSUED Party: BOSCHI, ALMA D
Date: December 20, 2017SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 5 010918 Party: BOSCHI, ALMA D
Date: January 15, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Doc # 14 BOSCHI, ALMA D Vol./Book 21058, Page 1496, 5 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 15
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN)
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 13
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN) CURRENT ACTIVITY
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Doc # 12 AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT THEREOF
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE Doc # 11
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 10
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO CLERK RE Doc # 9 WOULD LIKE AGREEMENT TO PAYMENTS BY DEFT
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER OF Doc # 8 AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL W/ATTACHED COPY SUMMONS Party: BOSCHI, ALMA D
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.