Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Casa Del Sol Madrid Condominium Association Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Daniel F Pilka, against Naef, Dale B, Unknown Spouse Of Dale B Naef, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2017 |
CategoryMortgage Foreclosure - County |
Last RefreshedJuly 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Doc # 23 NAEF, DALE B / UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DALE B NAEF Vol./Book 20637, Page 2198, 5 pages
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 24
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL DATE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN)
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. Doc # 21 UNKNOWN ADDRESS FOR DEFT DALE B NAEF
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. Doc # 22 UNKNOWN ADDRESS FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DALE B NAEF
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
May 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 20
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT Doc # 19 062518
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING Doc # 18 Party: UNKNOWN TENANTS
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE Doc # 17 Party: UNKNOWN TENANTS
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
|
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED Doc # 16 Party: UNKNOWN TENANTS
Judge: JAGGER, EDWIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.