Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Flynn Lavrar, Esq, against Sosnowski, Jerry P, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims 4 - $2,501 - $5,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
NOTICE Doc # 4 OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY
Date: December 28, 2017NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE Doc # 3
Date: December 28, 2017ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT Doc # 2 ACCOUNT SUMMARY
Date: December 28, 2017ALIAS NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Doc # 11 VIA ATTORNEY Party: SOSNOWSKI, JERRY P
Date: July 26, 2018CANCELED SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN) NON-SERVICE
Date: August 30, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 5 NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: December 28, 2017STATEMENT OF CLAIM Doc # 1
Date: December 28, 2017REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS Doc # 14
Date: July 25, 2018AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE Doc # 10 Party: SOSNOWSKI, JERRY P
Date: January 31, 2018(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 17 W/O PREJUDICE
Date: August 10, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
CANCELED SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN) NON-SERVICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 17 W/O PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 16
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
ALIAS NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED Doc # 15 Party: SOSNOWSKI, JERRY P
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
ALIAS NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Doc # 11 VIA ATTORNEY Party: SOSNOWSKI, JERRY P
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Doc # 13 Party: SOSNOWSKI, JERRY P
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
ALIAS NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Doc # 12
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS Doc # 14
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE Doc # 10 Party: SOSNOWSKI, JERRY P
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.