Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Td Bank Usa N A, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Flynn Lavrar, Esq, against Price, Heidi, represented by Alejandro Emilio Gomez, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
This complaint is a summary of account activity for a Target REDcard. The document includes information about the account balance, payments, fees, and interest charged. The previous balance was $392.60, and the new balance is $328.99. The minimum pay...
NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE Doc # 3
Date: December 28, 2017SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 5 NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: December 28, 2017NOTICE Doc # 4 OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY
Date: December 28, 2017ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT Doc # 2 ACCOUNT SUMMARY
Date: December 28, 2017STATEMENT OF CLAIM Doc # 1
Date: December 28, 2017NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Doc # 6 Party: PRICE, HEIDI
Date: January 02, 2018SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Doc # 8 Party: PRICE, HEIDI
Date: January 02, 2018NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Doc # 7
Date: January 02, 2018SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Doc # 13 Party: PRICE, HEIDI
Date: July 26, 2018NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED Doc # 10 Party: PRICE, HEIDI
Date: February 08, 2018REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS Doc # 14
Date: July 24, 2018ALIAS NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Doc # 12
Date: July 26, 2018ALIAS NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Doc # 11 VIA ATTORNEY Party: PRICE, HEIDI
Date: July 26, 2018ALIAS NOTICE TO APPEAR - SERVED Doc # 15 Party: PRICE, HEIDI
Date: August 15, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 16 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS Party: PRICE, HEIDI
Date: August 23, 2018STIPULATION Doc # 21 FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: October 19, 2018ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Doc # 17 Party: PRICE, HEIDI
Date: August 28, 2018RESET NOTICE MAILED-EMAILED Doc # 20 DEFT - EMAILED Party: GOMEZ, ALEJANDRO EMILIO, ESQ
Date: August 30, 2018RESET NOTICE MAILED-EMAILED Doc # 19 PLTF - EMAILED Party: LaVRAR, FLYNN, ESQ
Date: August 30, 2018ORDER APPROVING Doc # 23 STIPULATION AND DISMISSING
Date: October 29, 2018(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 24 W/PREJUDICE
Date: January 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 24 W/PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING Doc # 23 STIPULATION AND DISMISSING
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED-SETTLEMENT AFTER HRG (SRS DISPO) Doc # 22
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
October 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION Doc # 21 FOR SETTLEMENT
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
RESET NOTICE MAILED-EMAILED Doc # 20 DEFT - EMAILED Party: GOMEZ, ALEJANDRO EMILIO, ESQ
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
RESET NOTICE MAILED-EMAILED Doc # 19 PLTF - EMAILED Party: LaVRAR, FLYNN, ESQ
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONTINUED PRETRIAL RE Doc # 18 10/23/2018 8:30 AM
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Doc # 17 Party: PRICE, HEIDI
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.