Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Baker Distributing Company Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Jessie E Bowden, Esq, against Muldoon, Richard, Sunrise Air Conditioning And Heating Inc, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
STATEMENT OF CLAIM Doc # 3
Date: December 27, 2017NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Doc # 7 Party: SUNRISE AIR CONDITIONING AND HEATING INC
Date: December 29, 2017NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Doc # 8
Date: December 29, 2017NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Doc # 6 Party: MULDOON, RICHARD
Date: December 29, 2017ORDER Doc # 14 APPROVING STIPULATION TO STAY
Date: January 29, 2018AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS Doc # 11 Party: MULDOON, RICHARD
Date: January 16, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 1 REQUEST
Date: December 27, 2017STIPULATION Doc # 12 TO STAY JUDGMENT
Date: January 17, 2018AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS Doc # 10 Party: SUNRISE AIR CONDITIONING AND HEATING INC
Date: January 16, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 2 REQUEST
Date: December 27, 2017(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 19 W/PREJUDICE
Date: March 04, 2019SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE Doc # 17 NOT TO DISMISS CASE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION
Date: November 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 19 W/PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 18
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
CANCELED DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN) CURRENT ACTIVITY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE Doc # 17 NOT TO DISMISS CASE FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 16
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 15
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER Doc # 14 APPROVING STIPULATION TO STAY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer KELLY, LORRAINE) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SETTLEMENT Doc # 13
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION Doc # 12 TO STAY JUDGMENT
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.