Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bayfront Hma Medical Center Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Anthony J Steele, against Willis, Sarah L, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Doc # 3 Party: WILLIS, SARAH L
Date: December 27, 2017CANCELED SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT) NON-SERVICE
Date: January 23, 2018NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Doc # 4
Date: December 27, 2017SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Doc # 9 Party: WILLIS, SARAH L
Date: March 30, 2018SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Doc # 5 Party: WILLIS, SARAH L
Date: December 27, 2017ALIAS NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Doc # 7 VIA ATTORNEY Party: WILLIS, SARAH L
Date: March 30, 2018ALIAS NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Doc # 8
Date: March 30, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 2 NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: December 27, 2017NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED Doc # 6 Party: WILLIS, SARAH L
Date: January 12, 2018REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS Doc # 10 Party: WILLIS, SARAH L
Date: March 28, 2018STATEMENT OF CLAIM Doc # 1
Date: December 27, 2017ALIAS SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Doc # 11 Party: WILLIS, SARAH L
Date: May 01, 2018(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 13 W/OUT PREJUDICE
Date: May 22, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 13 W/OUT PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 12
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
CANCELED SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT) NON-SERVICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
ALIAS SUMMONS - NOT SERVED Doc # 11 Party: WILLIS, SARAH L
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
March 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Doc # 9 Party: WILLIS, SARAH L
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
March 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
ALIAS NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Doc # 7 VIA ATTORNEY Party: WILLIS, SARAH L
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
March 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
ALIAS NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Doc # 8
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ALIAS SUMMONS Doc # 10 Party: WILLIS, SARAH L
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
CANCELED SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT) NON-SERVICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED Doc # 6 Party: WILLIS, SARAH L
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.