Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Joseph F Rosen, Esq, against Brown, Shane D, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
STATEMENT OF CLAIM Doc # 1 W/ATTACHMENT
Date: December 20, 2017NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Doc # 4 Party: BROWN, SHANE D
Date: December 22, 2017NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Doc # 5
Date: December 22, 2017SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 3 NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: December 20, 2017NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED Doc # 7 Party: BROWN, SHANE D
Date: January 15, 2018NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. Doc # 10 NO FORWARDING ADDRESS Party: BROWN, SHANE D
Date: September 25, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Doc # 11 BROWN, SHANE D
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 12
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. Doc # 10 NO FORWARDING ADDRESS Party: BROWN, SHANE D
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 9
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer KELLY, LORRAINE) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SERVICE Doc # 8
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED Doc # 7 Party: BROWN, SHANE D
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Doc # 4 Party: BROWN, SHANE D
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Doc # 5
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.