Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Joseph F Rosen, Esq, against Toszew, Arthur P, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 12
Date: November 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 12
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Doc # 10 TOSZEW, ARTHUR P Vol./Book 20294, Page 394, 7 pages
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 11
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 9
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SERVICE Doc # 8
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED Doc # 7 Party: TOSZEW, ARTHUR P
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Doc # 6 Party: TOSZEW, ARTHUR P
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Doc # 5
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.