Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Joseph F Rosen, Esq, against Winowich, Chris, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims 4 - $2,501 - $5,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 3 NOT USED BY CLERK
Date: December 20, 2017NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Doc # 5
Date: December 21, 2017CANCELED SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT) NON-SERVICE
Date: January 23, 2018NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Doc # 4 Party: WINOWICH, CHRIS
Date: December 21, 2017SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Doc # 6 Party: WINOWICH, CHRIS
Date: December 21, 2017MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Doc # 10 WINOWICH, CHRIS Vol./Book 20294, Page 329, 7 pages
Date: October 01, 2018DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 2
Date: December 20, 2017STATEMENT OF CLAIM Doc # 1 WITH ATTACHMENT
Date: December 20, 2017NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED Doc # 7 Party: WINOWICH, CHRIS
Date: January 15, 2018NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 12 W/O PREJUDICE
Date: April 17, 2019NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. Doc # 9 NO FORWARDING ADDRESS Party: WINOWICH, CHRIS
Date: September 17, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 12 W/O PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
MASTER ORDER OF DISMISSAL Doc # 10 WINOWICH, CHRIS Vol./Book 20294, Page 329, 7 pages
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 11
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL-FAILURE TO PROSECUTE-SC (12:00 AM) (Judicial Officer CARASSAS, JOHN)
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION RETD BY P.O. Doc # 9 NO FORWARDING ADDRESS Party: WINOWICH, CHRIS
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-LACK OF PROSECUTION MAILED TO ALL PARTIES Doc # 8
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
CANCELED SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT) NON-SERVICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED Doc # 7 Party: WINOWICH, CHRIS
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Doc # 5
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Doc # 4 Party: WINOWICH, CHRIS
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.