Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Boyd, Yolanda L, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Davis, Harry, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2017 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Injunction Without Kids |
Last RefreshedJanuary 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED COPY Doc # 16 ORDER OF DISMISSAL NO RESPONDENT ADDRESS
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Doc # 15 EMERGENCY EXTENSION NOTICE
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 13
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF INJUNCTION Doc # 14 DOMESTIC VIOLENCE Vol./Book 19783, Page 599, 1 pages
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER EXTENDING INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION Doc # 10 PER A.O. 17-051 092017 1:30
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
COPY Doc # 11 OF ORDER MAILED TO PETITIONER
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT-SERVICE OF PROCESS Doc # 12 OF SERVICE OF INJUNCTION 090217 Party: DAVIS, HARRY
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION W/OUT CHILDREN (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officers HELINGER, JACK, HELINGER, JACK)
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 3
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
CC PETITION WITH ATTACHMENTS TO SHF Doc # 9 PINELLAS
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.