Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Yerby, Tony, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Yerby, Tony Curt, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, AMY M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2017 |
CategoryDomestic Violence Injunction Without Kids |
Last RefreshedJanuary 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Doc # 17 EMERGENCY EXTENSION NOTICE RETURNED SERVED 091517
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
SWORN STATEMENT OF POSSESSION OF FIREARMS ETC Doc # 16 Party: YERBY, TONY CURT
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION-DOM VIOLENCE Doc # 15 9/20/2018 DOMESTIC VIOLENCE Vol./Book 19781, Page 112, 7 pages
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
September 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 14
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER EXTENDING INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION Doc # 12 PER A.O. 17-051 092017 1:30
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
COPY Doc # 13 OF ORDER MAILED TO PETITIONER
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION W/OUT CHILDREN (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officers HELINGER, JACK, HELINGER, JACK)
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
September 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Doc # 11 TEMP INJUNCTION RETURNED SERVED 090117
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 3
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT REGARDING IDENTIFICATION Doc # 8
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.