Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mri Associates Of St Pete Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Derek W Bernstein, Esq, against State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins Co, represented by Jarod L Gilbert, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims Pip 3 - $501 - $2,500 |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
RESET NOTICE MAILED-EMAILED Doc # 34 Party: GILBERT, JAROD L, ESQ
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 9 05022017 SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 8 04282017 REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 7 04282017 NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERR
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 6 04282017 PLAINT REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 5 04282017 REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 4 04282017 CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 3 04282017 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 2 04282017 COMPLAINT
Date: December 20, 2017CC ORDER TRANSFER CAUSE FROM Doc # 1 HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY 17-CC-016198 WITH ATTACHED CASE SUMMARY
Date: December 20, 2017PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW Doc # 37
Date: June 13, 2018(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 40 WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: July 31, 2018FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 38
Date: July 31, 2018RESET NOTICE MAILED-EMAILED Doc # 33 Party: BERNSTEIN, DEREK W, ESQ
Date: December 20, 2017RECEIPT Doc # 32 FOR TRANSFERRED PLEADINGS
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 31 12132017 ATTORNEY LETTER REGARDING TRANSFER FEES
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 29 12052017 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 30 12112017 LETTER FROM CLERK REQUESTING TRANSFER FEES
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 28 10302017 COURT TICKET
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 26 07132017 NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAIN INTERR
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 27 07172017 NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 25 07132017 NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF ANTHONY ROMNEY
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 24 07132017 DEFT REQUEST FOR COURT TO TAKE JUDICAL NOTICE
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 23 06272017 DEFT MOTION TO TRANSFER
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 22 06272017 REPLY TO AFFIRMATIE DEFENSES AND MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 21 06262017 PRIVILEGE LOG
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 20 06262017 RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 18 06252017 NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERR
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 19 06252017 RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 16 06202017 ORDER ON JOINT STIP
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 17 06232017 ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 15 06062017 JOINT STIP GRANTING MOTION FOR TIME TO RESPOND
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 14 05172017 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 13 05172017 EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 12 05172017 DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 10 05102017 RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 20, 2017TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 11 05172017 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: December 20, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 40 WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 38
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 39
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW Doc # 37
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 36 AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS Party: MRI ASSOCIATES OF ST PETE INC
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PENDING RE Doc # 35 DISCOVERY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
RESET NOTICE MAILED-EMAILED Doc # 34 Party: GILBERT, JAROD L, ESQ
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 9 05022017 SUMMONS ISSUED
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
TRANSFER CASE DOCKET ENTRY Doc # 8 04282017 REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.