Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Florida Department Of Revenue Obo, Brinson, Otavia Shavese, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Polhill, Myquil Leray, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2017 |
CategoryIv-D Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 28 W/OUT PREJUDICE
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 25
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 26
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 27 ATTACHED DNA TEST REPORT
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT Doc # 23 PATERNITY DECLARATION
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
DISPLAY BIRTH RECORD Doc # 22 AS EXHIBIT (2)
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINDINGS-ORDER OF COURT RE Doc # 24 DNA TESTING
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINDINGS-ORDER OF COURT RE Doc # 21 CONTINUANCE 091718 9:30
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINDINGS-ORDER OF COURT RE Doc # 20 CONTINUANCE 071118 8:30
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE SETTING TRIAL-HEARING Doc # 19 050918 9:30
Judge: RAMSBERGER, THOMAS M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.