Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Outbidya Inc, filed a(n) Declaratory - Circuit case represented by Roy C Skelton, Esq, against Grand Bellagio At Baywatch Condominium Association Inc, Laney, Gwendolyn R, Laney, Jack R, represented by G Dauglas Nail, Esq, Jim Loncarski, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with MEYER, KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryDeclaratory - Circuit |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
|
This complaint is a legal action filed by the plaintiff, OUTBIDYA, INC., against the defendants, JACK R. LANEY, GWENDOLYN R. LANEY, and GRAND BELLAGIO AT BAYWATCH CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC. The plaintiff is seeking a declaratory judgment and addit...
EXHIBIT Doc # 6 CERTIFICATE OF TITLE CASE 11-5392-CI
Date: December 28, 2017EXHIBIT Doc # 10 CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ON CASE 16-6952-CI
Date: December 28, 2017EXHIBIT Doc # 9 FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLSURE ON CASE 16-6952-CI
Date: December 28, 2017EXHIBIT Doc # 8 ASSIGNMENT OF PARKING SPACES
Date: December 28, 2017EXHIBIT Doc # 7 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS CASE 16-6952-CI
Date: December 28, 2017DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 13
Date: February 16, 2018COMPLAINT Doc # 2
Date: December 28, 2017EXHIBIT Doc # 3 MORTGAGE
Date: December 28, 2017EXHIBIT Doc # 5 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS CASE 11-5392-CI
Date: December 28, 2017EXHIBIT Doc # 4 AMENDED CLAIM OF LIEN
Date: December 28, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 1
Date: December 28, 2017NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 12 Party: LANEY, GWENDOLYN R Party: LANEY, JACK R
Date: February 16, 2018DEF-RESP'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Doc # 14 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: February 16, 2018DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 17
Date: March 22, 2018(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 19 W/PREJUDICE
Date: September 17, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 19 W/PREJUDICE
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 18
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | (NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 19W/PREJUDICE | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 18 | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 16 Party: GRAND BELLAGIO AT BAYWATCH CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 17
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 16Party: GRAND BELLAGIO AT BAYWATCH CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) Doc # 17 | |
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Doc # 15 Party: GRAND BELLAGIO AT BAYWATCH CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC
Judge: MEYER, KEITH |
|
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Doc # 15Party: GRAND BELLAGIO AT BAYWATCH CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.