Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jovanovic, Rada, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Sumeet Kaul, against Esurance Property And Casualty Insurance Company, Gibney, Dawn, Gibney, Joseph, Gibney, Vincent, represented by Cosmo Bloom, Esq, Ryan Boda, Ryan T Boda, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, AMY M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a response to an amended complaint filed in the Circuit Court of the Sixth Judicial Circuit in Pinellas County, Florida. The defendants, Joseph Gibney, Vincent Gibney, and Dawn Gibney, admit to certain allegations and deny others. T...
NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 71
Date: May 10, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE OF Doc # 74 AUTOMOBILE INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 10, 2019RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 72
Date: May 10, 2019REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 76
Date: May 10, 2019EXHIBIT Doc # 65 A - ESURANCE INSURANCE DOCUMENTS
Date: March 13, 2019REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 77
Date: May 24, 2019REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 67
Date: March 13, 2019RESPONSE Doc # 62 TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: March 05, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 68
Date: March 13, 2019DEF-RESP'S MOTION Doc # 48 TO ENFORCE CME AND REQUIRE NOTIFICATION OF SURGERY
Date: October 11, 2018NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 40 072518
Date: July 25, 2018NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 35
Date: May 09, 2018SUPPLEMENTAL Doc # 42 RESPONSE TO REOUEST TO PRODUCE #9
Date: August 15, 2018RESPONSE Doc # 36 TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: May 22, 2018NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 33
Date: April 20, 2018RESPONSE Doc # 37 TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: June 20, 2018REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 19
Date: January 18, 2018RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 23
Date: January 26, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 17
Date: January 18, 2018ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Doc # 16 JOSEPH GIBNEY, VINCENT GIBNEY AND DAWN GIBNEY
Date: January 18, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 2
Date: December 28, 2017RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 70
Date: May 10, 2019ORDER Doc # 60 GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 12, 2019REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 59
Date: February 01, 2019AMENDED COMPLAINT Doc # 64
Date: March 13, 2019RESPONSE Doc # 38 TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: June 20, 2018RESPONSE Doc # 39 TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: June 28, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 29
Date: April 04, 2018RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 27
Date: March 15, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 28
Date: April 04, 2018RESPONSE Doc # 56 TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: December 11, 2018REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 57
Date: December 12, 2018JOINT STIPULATION Doc # 58 FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: January 30, 2019NOTICE OF CANCELLATION Doc # 54 OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 03, 2018CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 61 PROPOSED ORDER - RECEIVED BY COURT 021119
Date: February 12, 2019SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 5 ISSUED Party: GIBNEY, DAWN
Date: December 28, 2017REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 25
Date: March 02, 2018RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 20
Date: January 18, 2018RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 21
Date: January 18, 2018REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 66
Date: March 13, 2019NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY Doc # 53
Date: November 20, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 14 AS TO DAWN GIBNEY
Date: December 28, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 1
Date: December 28, 2017REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 11 AS TO VINCENT GIBNEY AND DAWN GIBNEY
Date: December 28, 2017SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 4 ISSUED Party: GIBNEY, VINCENT
Date: December 28, 2017NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 13 AS TO VINCENT GIBNEY
Date: December 28, 2017NOTICE OF INDEPENDENT MEDICAL EXAMINATION Doc # 49 111918 1:30
Date: October 11, 2018PLTF-PET'S MOTION TO AMEND Doc # 47 COMPLAINT
Date: October 09, 2018NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE Doc # 46 010919 1:00
Date: September 12, 2018REQUEST FOR COPIES Doc # 45
Date: September 10, 2018RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 31
Date: April 09, 2018NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION Doc # 43
Date: August 20, 2018RESPONSE Doc # 41 TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: August 07, 2018CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 52 HEARING - RECEIVED BY COURT 101718
Date: October 18, 2018RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 32
Date: April 09, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 26
Date: March 08, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 30
Date: April 04, 2018RESPONSE Doc # 34 TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: May 02, 2018REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 18
Date: January 18, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 3 ISSUED Party: GIBNEY, JOSEPH
Date: December 28, 2017RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 22
Date: January 18, 2018REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 8 AS TO VINCENT GIBNEY
Date: December 28, 2017REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 9 AS TO DAWN GIBNEY
Date: December 28, 2017NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 12 AS TO JOSEPH GIBNEY
Date: December 28, 2017REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 10 AS TO JOSEPH GIBNEY
Date: December 28, 2017COMPLAINT Doc # 6
Date: December 28, 2017REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 7 AS TO JOSEPH GIBNEY
Date: December 28, 2017RESPONSE Doc # 90 TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: September 19, 2019RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 80
Date: July 08, 2019DEF-RESP'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY Doc # 83
Date: August 05, 2019NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Doc # 88
Date: September 04, 2019NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL Doc # 89
Date: September 09, 2019ORDER GRANTING Doc # 86 (EX-PARTE) DEFT MTN COMPEL DISCOVERY
Date: August 15, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE ANSWERS INTERROGATORIES Doc # 81
Date: July 17, 2019FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 93
Date: June 03, 2020REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 82
Date: July 31, 2019RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 85
Date: August 09, 2019NOT. OF SERV. OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Doc # 84
Date: August 09, 2019CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 87 PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED BY COURT 081319
Date: August 15, 2019NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 92 WITH PREJUDICE
Date: June 03, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 93
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 92 WITH PREJUDICE
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED-SETTLEMENT AFTER HRG (SRS DISPO) Doc # 91
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE Doc # 90 TO REQUEST FOR COPIES
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE Doc # 90TO REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL Doc # 89
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL Doc # 89 | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Doc # 88
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT Doc # 88 | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING Doc # 86 (EX-PARTE) DEFT MTN COMPEL DISCOVERY
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.