Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ocwen Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Willnae Lacroix, against Curlew Landings South Homeowners Association Inc, Smith, Christine, Smith, Jerry L, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with WILLIAMS, AMY M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWILLIAMS, AMY M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategoryReal Prop - Homestead Res Foreclosure3 $250,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a legal document related to a mortgage loan. The document includes definitions of various terms used in the document, such as "Security Instrument," "Borrower," "MERS," and "Lender." It also includes information about the property, ...
NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 36 ***ESF PAID***
Date: May 30, 2018REQUEST FOR SURPLUS TRUSTEE SENT TO STATE Doc # 43
Date: September 06, 2018CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Doc # 41 Vol./Book 20125, Page 626, 1 pages
Date: July 05, 2018VALUE OF REAL PROP-MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM Doc # 2
Date: December 27, 2017COMPLAINT Doc # 4 FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE
Date: December 27, 2017SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 16 010218 Party: CURLEW LANDINGS SOUTH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC
Date: February 08, 2018ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT Doc # 6 EXIB B - MORTGAGE
Date: December 27, 2017SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 13 ISSUED Party: SMITH, JERRY L
Date: December 27, 2017NOTICE TO HOMEOWNER Doc # 7 FORM C
Date: December 27, 2017NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 10 CERTIFICATION AS TO POSSESSION ORIGINAL NOTE
Date: December 27, 2017SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 17 012018 Party: SMITH, JERRY L
Date: February 08, 2018FORM A-PLAINTIFF CERTIFICATE Doc # 9
Date: December 27, 2017NOTICE OF APPT OF SURPLUS TRUSTEE Doc # 44
Date: September 06, 2018TERMINATION OF SURPLUS TRUSTEE Doc # 45
Date: September 13, 2019CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES Doc # 30
Date: May 15, 2018FEES DUE LETTER FROM CLERK Doc # 35 $49 SERVICE CHARGE FEE-PD 053118
Date: May 23, 2018AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS Doc # 27
Date: May 10, 2018WITNESS LIST Doc # 24 AND EXHIBIT LIST FOR TRIAL
Date: April 13, 2018PUBLISHER'S AFFIDAVIT NOTICE OF SALE Doc # 38
Date: June 08, 2018CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS Doc # 42
Date: July 05, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 12 ISSUED Party: SMITH, CHRISTINE
Date: December 27, 2017ATTACHMENT Doc # 11 CERTIFICATION OF POSSESSION OF THE NOTE
Date: December 27, 2017NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 31 ORIGINAL NOTE AND MORTGAGE
Date: May 21, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 1
Date: December 27, 2017WITNESS LIST Doc # 29 / EXHIBIT LIST AMENDED BY PLTF
Date: May 14, 2018FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE Doc # 34 Vol./Book 20063, Page 1938, 6 pages
Date: May 21, 2018WITNESS LIST Doc # 28 (PLTF AMENDED) AND EXHIBIT LISTS
Date: May 14, 2018ORDER SCHEDULING NON-JURY TRIAL Doc # 22 052118 9:45
Date: April 03, 2018FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 32
Date: May 21, 2018CERTIFICATE OF SALE Doc # 39 EARL S ANDERSEN
Date: June 20, 2018CORRESPONDENCE TO COURT RE Doc # 23 PROPOSED ORDERS RECEIVED BY COURT 040218
Date: April 03, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING Doc # 21 052118 9:45
Date: March 21, 2018NOTICE CAUSE IS AT ISSUE READY FOR TRIAL Doc # 20 W/ATTACHED CERTIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE
Date: February 16, 2018MOTION FOR DEFAULT Doc # 19 ENTERED Party: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC
Date: February 09, 2018AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 18 BY PLTF
Date: February 09, 2018SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 15 012018 Party: SMITH, CHRISTINE
Date: February 08, 2018ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT Doc # 5 EXIB A - NOTE
Date: December 27, 2017NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 26 AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS
Date: May 10, 2018PLAINTIFF-LENDER CONTACT INFORMATION SHEET Doc # 8 FORM D
Date: December 27, 2017SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 14 ISSUED Party: CURLEW LANDINGS SOUTH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC
Date: December 27, 2017ASSIGNMENT Doc # 37 OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND FORECLOSURE SALE BID
Date: June 04, 2018NOTICE OF FILING Doc # 40 ATTACHED AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL ADVANCES
Date: June 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
UNCLAIMED SURPLUS FUNDS DEPOSITED WITH STATE UNDER F.S.717 Doc # 46 2019 FORECLOSURE SURPLUS FUNDS DEPOSITED IN 2020
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
FS 717 FORECLOSURE SURPLUS FUNDS TO BE REPORTED AS UNCLAIMED
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
TERMINATION OF SURPLUS TRUSTEE Doc # 45
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | TERMINATION OF SURPLUS TRUSTEE Doc # 45 | |
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR SURPLUS TRUSTEE SENT TO STATE Doc # 43
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPT OF SURPLUS TRUSTEE Doc # 44
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SURPLUS TRUSTEE SENT TO STATE Doc # 43 | |
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPT OF SURPLUS TRUSTEE Doc # 44 | |
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE Doc # 41 Vol./Book 20125, Page 626, 1 pages
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
|
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS Doc # 42
Judge: WILLIAMS, AMY M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.