Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Geico Indemnity Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gary S Rabin, against Lytle, Brian, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with DAY, JACK presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2017 |
CategoryAuto Negligence - Circuit |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
COMPLAINT Doc # 4 FOR UNINSURED MOTORIST SUBROGATION
Date: December 20, 2017SUMMONS - SERVED Doc # 5 010518 Party: LYTLE, BRIAN
Date: January 11, 2018FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 12 AGAINST DEFT Vol./Book 20054, Page 1092, 1 pages
Date: May 11, 2018PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Doc # 7 ENTERED
Date: March 19, 2018AFFIDAVIT Doc # 6 OF DAMAGES AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Date: March 16, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET Doc # 1
Date: December 20, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 2
Date: December 20, 2017SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED Doc # 3 ISSUED Party: LYTLE, BRIAN
Date: December 20, 2017DEFAULT ENTERED Doc # 8 Party: LYTLE, BRIAN
Date: March 21, 2018MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 9
Date: May 08, 2018AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS Doc # 10
Date: May 08, 2018SUMMONS - RETURNED SERVED Doc # 5 010518 Party: LYTLE, BRIAN
Date: January 11, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING Doc # 13
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING Doc # 13 | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
CC JUDGMENT MADE-HANDED RECORDING Doc # 13
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 12 AGAINST DEFT Vol./Book 20054, Page 1092, 1 pages
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Doc # 11
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 12AGAINST DEFTVol./Book 20054, Page 1092, 1 pages | |
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Doc # 11 | |
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 9
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS Doc # 10
Judge: DAY, JACK |
|
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 9 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.