Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Kings Manor Estates Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Lindsey M Porter, against Simoni, Benjamin, Simoni, Melissa, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with KELLY, LORRAINE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2017 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED Doc # 7 090717 Party: SIMONI, MELISSA
Date: September 18, 2017SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED Doc # 8 090717 Party: SIMONI, BENJAMIN
Date: September 18, 2017VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 6
Date: September 18, 2017PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Doc # 9 AS TO COUNT I //DEFAULT ENTERED
Date: September 18, 2017COMPLAINT Doc # 2 WITH ATTACHMENTS
Date: August 31, 2017FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 13
Date: September 25, 2017DEFAULT ENTERED Doc # 11 Party: SIMONI, BENJAMIN Party: SIMONI, MELISSA
Date: September 19, 2017PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 10
Date: September 18, 2017(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 14 W/PREJUDICE BY PLTF
Date: September 25, 2017(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 15 W/PREJUDICE BY PLTF (AMENDED)
Date: September 29, 2017FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 5
Date: September 18, 2017SUMMONS ISSUED AT COUNTER Doc # 3 Party: SIMONI, BENJAMIN Party: SIMONI, MELISSA
Date: September 05, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 1
Date: August 31, 2017CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Doc # 4 Party: SIMONI, BENJAMIN Party: SIMONI, MELISSA
Date: September 06, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 15 W/PREJUDICE BY PLTF (AMENDED)
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 13
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 14 W/PREJUDICE BY PLTF
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - BEFORE HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 12
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Doc # 11 Party: SIMONI, BENJAMIN Party: SIMONI, MELISSA
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED Doc # 7 090717 Party: SIMONI, MELISSA
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED Doc # 8 090717 Party: SIMONI, BENJAMIN
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 6
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT Doc # 9 AS TO COUNT I //DEFAULT ENTERED
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT Doc # 10
Judge: KELLY, LORRAINE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.