Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Avbh Bel Air Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Charles V Barrett, Iii, against Smith, Terrick, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA SCOTT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2017 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is an action to evict a tenant from a property in Pinellas County, Florida. The plaintiff, AVBH BEL AIR LLC, is the landlord of the property, known as Bel Air Apartments. The defendant, Terrick Smith, is the tenant who has possession o...
DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT Doc # 14 Party: SMITH, TERRICK
Date: September 28, 2017CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Doc # 7 Party: SMITH, TERRICK
Date: September 01, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED Doc # 1
Date: August 31, 2017ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT Doc # 4 LEASE
Date: August 31, 2017NOTICE Doc # 3 THREE DAY NOTICE
Date: August 31, 2017COMPLAINT Doc # 2 - II COUNTS
Date: August 31, 2017NOTICE Doc # 5 FAIR DEBT COLLECTION PRACTICES ACT
Date: August 31, 2017ANSWER OF Doc # 8 Party: SMITH, TERRICK
Date: September 14, 2017WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 17 EXECUTED
Date: October 09, 2017FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Doc # 13 Vol./Book 19789, Page 828, 1 pages
Date: September 28, 2017SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF Doc # 6 FOR SERVICE BY PROCESS SERVER Party: SMITH, TERRICK
Date: September 01, 2017FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 16
Date: September 29, 2017PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT Doc # 11
Date: September 22, 2017SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED Doc # 9 090217 Party: SMITH, TERRICK
Date: September 22, 2017VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 10
Date: September 22, 2017WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 15 ISSUED TO ATTY
Date: September 29, 2017(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 18 AS TO COUNT II W/O PREJUDICE
Date: November 06, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 18 AS TO COUNT II W/O PREJUDICE
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
October 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 17 EXECUTED
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM Doc # 16
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION Doc # 15 ISSUED TO ATTY
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED BY COURT Doc # 14 Party: SMITH, TERRICK
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Doc # 13 Vol./Book 19789, Page 828, 1 pages
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
September 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO) Doc # 12
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR COURT DEFAULT Doc # 11
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED Doc # 9 090217 Party: SMITH, TERRICK
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
|
September 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE Doc # 10
Judge: McNARY, MYRA SCOTT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.