Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Great Lakes Glass Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Marc B Nussbaum, Esq, William A Kebler, Esq, against Usaa Casualty Insurance Company, represented by William A Kebler, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with JAGGER, EDWIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims 2 - $101 - $500 |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Doc # 19 9/27/2018 - 10/2/2018
Date: July 10, 2018ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Doc # 15 USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY
Date: October 26, 2017REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS Doc # 5
Date: August 31, 2017REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION Doc # 6
Date: August 31, 2017NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES Doc # 4
Date: August 31, 2017STATEMENT OF CLAIM Doc # 3
Date: August 31, 2017EXHIBIT Doc # 2 A - INVOICE
Date: August 31, 2017NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Doc # 8 Party: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: September 01, 2017COMPLAINT Doc # 1
Date: August 31, 2017SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Doc # 10 Party: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: September 01, 2017NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Doc # 9
Date: September 01, 2017NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM Doc # 12 USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY 090617
Date: September 06, 2017NOTICE-SERVICE-PROCESS INS COMM Doc # 11 USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY 090617
Date: September 06, 2017NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 17 EMAIL Party: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: November 07, 2017NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Doc # 18
Date: March 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE DISMISSED - AFTER HEARING (SRS DISPOSITION) Doc # 20
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
(NON RECORDED) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Doc # 21 WITH PREJUDICE
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Doc # 19 9/27/2018 - 10/2/2018
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY Doc # 18
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Doc # 17 EMAIL Party: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
REPLY Doc # 16 AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND/OR MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
ANSWER-AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF Doc # 15 USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Doc # 14
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer JAGGER, EDWIN) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
|
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PENDING RE Doc # 13 DISCOVERY
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, SOUTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.