Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Flynn Lavrar, Esq, against Wilson, Homer A, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with McNARY, MYRA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2017 |
CategorySmall Claims 4 - $2,501 - $5,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILE Doc # 2
Date: August 31, 2017NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Doc # 5
Date: September 01, 2017SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Doc # 6 Party: WILSON, HOMER A
Date: September 01, 2017STATEMENT OF CLAIM Doc # 1 WITH ATTACHMENTS
Date: August 31, 2017NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Doc # 4 Party: WILSON, HOMER A
Date: September 01, 2017STIPULATION Doc # 9 FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: January 18, 2018NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED Doc # 8 Party: WILSON, HOMER A
Date: October 20, 2017STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Doc # 12 PLTF-W/ATTACHED AFFIDAVIT EXHIBIT A
Date: November 09, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL Doc # 12 PLTF-W/ATTACHED AFFIDAVIT EXHIBIT A
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING Doc # 11 STIPULATION AND DISMISSING Vol./Book 19919, Page 318, 1 pages
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED-SETTLEMENT AFTER HRG (SRS DISPO) Doc # 10
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION Doc # 9 FOR SETTLEMENT
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO APPEAR - NOT SERVED Doc # 8 Party: WILSON, HOMER A
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
SMALL CLAIMS PRE TRIAL ICD (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer McNARY, MYRA SCOTT) Result: SC HEARING HELD
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
PRE-TRIAL CONTINUED PEND SERVICE Doc # 7
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE TO PLTF-PLTF ATTY Doc # 5
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS-NOTICE EMAILED TO ATTY-PLTF FOR SERVICE Doc # 6 Party: WILSON, HOMER A
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
|
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE-STMT OF CLAIM-DEFT Doc # 4 Party: WILSON, HOMER A
Judge: SMALL CLAIMS JUDGE, NORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.