Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cf Emerald Pointe Gardens Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Michael George F Davis, against Nalbone, Frank, in the jurisdiction of Pinellas County, FL, . Pinellas County, FL Superior Courts with CARASSAS, JOHN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2017 |
CategoryDelinquent Tenant - County |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPinellas County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED ISSUED Party: NALBONE, FRANK
Date: February 28, 2017CERTIFICATE OF MAILING Party: NALBONE, FRANK
Date: March 02, 2017MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: March 14, 2017WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTY
Date: March 28, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET - E-FILED
Date: February 28, 2017FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 19564, Page 1691, 1 pages
Date: March 23, 2017ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT THREE DAY NOTICE
Date: February 28, 2017COMPLAINT
Date: February 28, 2017DEFAULT ENTERED Party: NALBONE, FRANK
Date: March 14, 2017VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Date: March 14, 2017ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT LEASE
Date: February 28, 2017WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED
Date: April 18, 2017FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: March 14, 2017PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED
Date: March 14, 2017FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: March 23, 2017SUMMONS SERVED - POSTED 030317 Party: NALBONE, FRANK
Date: March 14, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION RETD EXECUTED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTY
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT- COUNT 1 POSSESSION Vol./Book 19564, Page 1691, 1 pages
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (SRS DISPO)
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED Party: NALBONE, FRANK
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
PLTF-PET'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT ENTERED
Judge: CARASSAS, JOHN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.